Grant/Rakim v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Abraham/Rasheen Grant/Rakim
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Watts and Newman
Case Number: 5:2014cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 104 Order, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/13/2015. (ljb)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 73 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION in its entirety in all respects and denying Plaintiff's 67 motion for preliminary injunctive relief without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/17/2014. (rhm)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER adopting 65 Partial Recommended Disposition in a all respects. Accordingly, Mr. Grant/Rakim's 64 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/14/2014. (ks)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting 58 the partial recommended disposition; and denying, without prejudice, 47 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/20/2014. (kdr)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 13 the partial recommendations; and denying 10 Mr. Grant/Rakim's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/2014. (kdr)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER finding service proper and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for defts Kelley, Watts, and Newman. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and copies of the complaint, along with any attachments and summonses for these defendants without prepayment of fees. Service for deft Kelley should be through the ADC Compliance Office. Service for defts Watts and Newman should be through Corizon, Inc., Humphries Law Firm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/8/14. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant/Rakim v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham/Rasheen Grant/Rakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?