Ashford v. Catoe et al

Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Defendant: Catoe and Taylor
Case Number: 5:2014cv00031
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 47 Order and Opinion entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of defendants, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/25/2015. (ks)
August 29, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 191 (a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/2014. (ks)
June 27, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 13 19 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Medical personnel at Tucker Max shall immediately give pla intiff a complete physical examination, photograph any injuries or evidence of scars etc., related to any injuries consistent with those described in plaintiff's amended complaint, and prepare a report noting in detail the results of their physical examination. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/2014. (ks)
June 11, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as moot. Defendants' Response 28 indicates that Defendants have served Plaintiff with responses to his 4/17/2014 Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/11/2014. (kcs)
May 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet to reflect that Defendant Catoe is "James Catoe" and Defendant Taylor is "Keith Taylor." 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Catoe, Taylor, is granted; 17 MOTION to Take Deposition from Charles Ashford filed by Catoe, Taylor is granted. Defendants must on or before 6/2/2014, comply with the instruction in this Order regarding the preservation of video recordings and photographs. Defendants must file any m otions on the issue of exhaustion on or before 6/16/2014. The parties must complete discovery on or before 9/29/2014, and must file dispositive motions, dealing with matter other than exhaustion on or before 10/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/08/2014. (kcs)
February 3, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/03/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Catoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?