Caldwell v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, D York, Floss and Ojiugo Iko
Case Number: 5:2014cv00042
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 108 the recommended disposition and dismissing Caldwell's lawsuit, with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/4/2015. (kdr)
January 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Plaintiff's Motion to Validate and Authenticate Documents; denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; granting 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling; and denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2015. (kcs)
December 10, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to 76 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/10/2014. (kcs)
December 1, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as specified herein 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part as specified herein 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part as specified herein 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/01/2014. (kcs)
October 16, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Clarification; directing the Clerk to file separately in the record motions 60 61 62 and pages 2-11 of 64 ; directing Defendants to file a Response to the Motions to Compel on or before 10/29/2014; and extending the dispositive motion deadline to 11/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/16/2014. (rhm)
August 25, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 49 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and denying 32 54 plaintiff's motions for a preliminary injunction and for an expedited ruling. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/2014. (kdr)
April 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/23/2014. (kcs)
April 8, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify; denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert; granting 12 Defendants' Motion to Take Deposition from John Caldwell; and granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/08/2014. (kcs)
February 10, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/10/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojiugo Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?