McCall v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00043
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice McCall's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. No certificate of appealability will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2014. (jak)
July 2, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding the attached letter from Plaintiff McCall. The parties in the case will have the opportunity to object to Judge Volpe's recommendation, whatever it may be. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2014. (jak)
March 19, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 5 Proposed Findings and Recommendations.; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. McCall's 2 Petition and 7 Supplement with Objections, needs evaluation in the normal course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?