Stiff v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Craig Stiff
Defendant: L Evans, Debra Perry, Eric Evans and Dermott Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 5:2014cv00055
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/25/2016. (kcs)
February 25, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to file, on or before 3/6/2015, a Response to 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Craig Stiff that includes copies of their discovery answers and documents they have provided to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/25/2015. (kcs)
September 16, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/16/2014. (kcs)
June 13, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a Response to 19 and 21 that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions in this order. Plaintiff is also advised to review the possible consequences that could occur, if the instructions in this order are not complied with fully. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/13/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiff v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?