Lindsey v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Lindsey
Defendant: Charles Schock, Maples, Sanya Peppers-Davis, Angela Stanford, Cherry Ann McGrath, Rory Griffin, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 5:2014cv00073
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Lindsey's claims against all defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/8/2014. (jak)
October 10, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an updated Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within fifteen days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to forward an in forma pauperis application to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/10/2014. (jak)
September 18, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 75 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Lindsey's claims against Shock and Stanford are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2014. (jak)
September 2, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Reconsideration, modifying 64 MOTION to Compel, directing the Clerk to forward to Plaintiff a copy of [58-1] and denying in all other respects 64 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/02/2014. (rhm)
August 19, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 70 Order: Judge Kearney's decision is affirmed and 68 Motion is denied. Lindsey's request to amend his complaint to add Corizon Medical Services as a defendant is granted. The Court orders the Clerk to prepare a summons for Corizon Medical Services. The Clerk shall deliver the summons, together with a copy of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on Humphries, Odum & Eubanks, who represents Corizon. This service is to be made without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2014. (jak)
August 18, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Judge Kearney's decision denying motion for a subpoena of some Health Department records 68 . Lindsey's request to amend his complaint to add Corizon Medical Services as a defendant is granted. The Court orders the Clerk to prepare a summons for Corizon Medical Services. The Clerk shall deliver the summons, together with a copy of the Complaint, to Humphries, Odum & Eubanks, who represent Corizon. This service is to be made without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/18/2014. (jak)
August 14, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Judge Kearney's decision re 62 Motion. Lindsey's appeal of Judge Kearney's discovery rulings, 63 , also fails. The Court sees no error of law or abuse of discretion. The Court also declines to remove Judge Kearney: Lindsey's allegations of bias are frivolous. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2014. (jak)
March 21, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS so Judge Kearney can address the new allegations in Lindsey's 7 Objections. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanya Peppers-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?