Simmons v. Rhodes et al

Plaintiff: Charles H Simmons
Defendant: Camron Rhodes, Peggy Pitts, Robbie Fred and Allen Cheek
Case Number: 5:2014cv00081
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 124 order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/28/2016. (rhm)
October 1, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 83 the partial recommended disposition; denying 72 Simmons's motion for summary judgment; and denying 75 his partial motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/2015. (kdr)
August 10, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting 66 partial recommended disposition in all respects; granting 40 summary judgment on Simmons's inadequate medical care claims against defendants Cheek and Pitts and dismissing these claims with prejudice; denying 40 summary judgment on Simmons's remaining claims and allowing him to proceed on these claims; and directing the clerk to terminate Cheeks and Pitts as defendants immediately. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/10/2015. (rhm)
January 6, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; denying 23 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal of this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/2015. (kdr)
March 6, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/06/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Rhodes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camron Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?