McClanton v. Bland et al

Plaintiff: Rodney Wilson McClanton
Defendant: William Warran, Estella Bland and Esaw
Case Number: 5:2014cv00084
Filed: March 6, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/19/2014. (ks)
May 29, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, which this Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/29/2014. (rhm)
May 7, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/07/2014. (rhm)
March 17, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/17/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClanton v. Bland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Wilson McClanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?