Curtis v. Gibson et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius Curtis
Defendant: Gibson, Banks, Lagron and Toni Perry
Case Number: 5:2014cv00090
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 92 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/07/2015. (rhm)
August 1, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 30 PARTIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as this Court's findings in all respects. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/01/2014. (rhm)
June 12, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and directing that plaintiff's allegation against defendant Toni Perry is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/12/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lagron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?