Brady v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Robert Jeffrey Brady
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Stephen Williams and Etory Kearney
Case Number: 5:2014cv00103
Filed: March 20, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 91 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/16/2015. (jak)
August 7, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 67 Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 55 62 67 Motions to Dismiss. Robert Brady's claims against Defendants McKenney, Stell, and Pratt are dismissed wi thout prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This matter is therefore again referred to United States Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, of all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/7/2015. (ks)
June 30, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Because Brady has been unable to locate and serve defendant Crowell within the time allowed under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, claims against this defendant are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/2015. (jak)
March 21, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty days pursuant to the instructions contained in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/21/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jeffrey Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etory Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?