Jones et al v. Iko et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Ojiugo Iko, Deborah Louise York, Randy Watson, Grant Harris, Yolanda Clark, Kaye Skillen and Doe
Case Number: 5:2014cv00108
Filed: March 24, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Jones's constitutional claims against York are dismissed with prejudice. His malpractice claim against York is dismissed without prejudice. Jones's claims against Skillen and Watson are dismissed with prejudice. Jones's claims against Clark, Goldman, and Harris are dismissed without prejudice. Jones's claims against Iko are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/2016. (jak)
November 17, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 90 Motion to Clarify. Jones's lawyer may file a similar motion if he decides it's appropriate after familiarizing himself with the case. In any event, all future motions and papers must be filed only by Jones's lawyer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2015. (jak)
November 3, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jones's appeal, 78 , is sustained in part and rejected in part. His motion to compel, 45 , is granted as modified in part and denied in part. And the pending recommendation, 80 , is adopted as modified. The case is returned to Magistrate Judge Kearney. He will appoint counsel and set a deadline for any second motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)
May 5, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 3 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Jones's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. The Court requests Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney to screen Jones's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Iko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojiugo Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Louise York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Skillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?