Thacker v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Harlie Thacker
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Sharon King, Ramona Huff, Sonya Anissa Peppers-Davis, Jacqueline Carswell, Dennise Krabbin and Corizon
Case Number: 5:2014cv00129
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 the recommended disposition; dismissing 51 Defendants' motion for summary judgment, and dismissing Thacker's complaint; dismissing 1 Thacker's complaint, without prejudice, with respect to his claims against We ndy Kelley and Sharon King, and dismissing with prejudice with respect to his claims against all other defendants; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/10/2016. (kdr)
December 31, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 50 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Sharon King are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/31/2015. (mcz)
December 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 the partial recommended disposition; and denying 37 defendant Corizon, LLC's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/2014. (kdr)
September 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety; granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Harlie Thacker's claims against Kelley are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thacker v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlie Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Anissa Peppers-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennise Krabbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?