Hill v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Jessie Hill
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00202
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 140 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Defendants' 126 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's allegations of failure to protect are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. All other allegations are DISMISSED with prejudice. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2015. (ks)
April 23, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 123 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Plaintiff's 116 motion for TRO, preliminary and permanent injunction is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/2015. (ks)
November 6, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Plaintiff's 68 72 motions for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order and for inspection, which this Court construes as motions for preliminary injunctive relief are DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/6/2014. (ks)
October 8, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 57 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's motions 6 , 12 , 33 , 53 , and 54 are denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/8/2014. (jak)
August 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Accordingly, Defendants Lee and Erwin are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Any claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1985 and the Federal Tort Claims Act are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/19/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?