Harrell v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: David Harrell
Defendant: Gerald Robinson, Lafayette Woods and Stanley James
Case Number: 5:2014cv00214
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT against David Harrell and for the City of Hot Springs, for Jefferson County, for sheriff Gerald Robinson, for deputy Lafayette Woods, and for Deputy Stanley James. Harrell's amended complaint, 20 , is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/25/2016. (jak)
May 24, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court inadvertently failed to dismiss Harrell's echoing Arkansas Civil Rights Act race claim when it dismissed his 1983 race claims, 90 . By agreement, the ACRA claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2016. (jak)
May 11, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On Harrell's unopposed motion, his 1983 claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/11/2016. (jak)
October 7, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has tried its best, but the current motion papers in this employment case are too tangled to unravel. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, 32 , is denied without prejudice. The motion to incorporate, 31 , is denied as moot. The Defendants may file a new dispositive motion by 13 November 2015. Please follow the Court's motion protocol. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2015. (jak)
September 9, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The summary-judgment papers are a bit tangled on the limitations issues. The Court would appreciate help on these points. Did Harrell get a right-to-sue letter on his February 2010 EEOC charge? If so, when? On the July 2012 charge: is there any precedent on a premature suit ripening into effectiveness after a right-to-sue letter is received? Simultaneous supplemental filings due on 18 September 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2015. (jak)
May 19, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk to reinstate the remaining defendants' motion for summary judgment, 32 , and motion to adopt Hot Springs' arguments on summary judgment, 31 , which do not appear to have been ruled on before the transfer. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. The Court will set a trial date and provide new deadlines for updated pre-trial disclosures, motions in limine, and jury instructions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harrell
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Robinson
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Woods
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley James
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?