Hanley v. Vilches et al

Plaintiff: David Antoine Hanley
Defendant: Brad Vilches and Gordon
Case Number: 5:2014cv00228
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Hanley's claims against the Pine Bluff Police Department are dismissed with prejudice. Hanley's claims against Gordon and Vilches are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/23/2015. (jak)
October 21, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Hanley to update his address with the Clerk of Court by 20 November 2015. If he doesn't, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to Hanley at the Randall L. Williams Correctional Facility, 7206 West 7th Avenue, Pine Bluff, Arkansas 71603. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2015. (jak)
July 2, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Hanley's claims against Gordon for failure to serve process. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2015. (jak)
May 22, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status reports due by 1 June 2015. Unless Hanley provides proof of service or shows good cause, the Court will dismiss the claims against Gordon without prejudice for failure to serve process. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/22/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanley v. Vilches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Antoine Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Vilches
Represented By: Amanda LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?