Deaton v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Deaton
Defendant: Jim Smith, Randy Watson, Moses Jackson, Mark Stevens, Fredrick D Gilbert and Grant Harris
Case Number: 5:2014cv00230
Filed: June 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 73 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/19/2015. (ljb)
August 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 63 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/19/2015. (ks)
February 3, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART 28 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION; granting in part and denying in part 13 motion to dismiss; and referring this action to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, of all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 02/03/2015. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deaton v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smith
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stevens
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick D Gilbert
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?