Hutts v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: James Hutts
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Connie Hubbard, Gina Snyder, Donna Gordon-Buie, Jennifer McBride, Ojibagu Iko, Deborah York and Amanda Watt
Case Number: 5:2014cv00269
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 77 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; denying Plaintiff James Hutt's 69 motion for injunctive relief; granting defendants' 64 motion for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice defendants Donna Gordon-Buie, Genia Snyder, and Amanda Watt; and dismissing with prejudice defendants Ojibagu Iko, M.D., Connie Hubbard, Jennifer McBride-Andrews, and Deborah York. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/30/2015. (rhm)
March 13, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court notes that discovery in this case continues until April 28, 2015. As the case progresses, Plaintiff may move for an extension of that deadline, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/13/2015. (jak)
December 4, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. Plaintiff James Hutts's allegations that he was denied redress through the grievance process in violation of his First Amendment rights is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/04/2014. (rhm)
October 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendants Snyder, McBride-Andrews, York, and Humphrey and for the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and 2 Complaint on defendants at the addresses provided under seal without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. The Clerk is directed to correct the names of Defendants Snyder, McBride-Andrews, and Humphrey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutts v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Gordon-Buie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojibagu Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?