Washington v. Hunter et al

Plaintiff: Athena Washington
Defendant: Cynthia Hunter, Greg Bolin, Tyra Tyler and D Butler
Case Number: 5:2014cv00274
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 45 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants, and this case is closed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2015. (ks)
March 25, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Hunter, Dolores Butler, Greg Bolin, Tyra Tyler and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts as set forth in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/25/2015. (kcs)
September 15, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Washington may proceed with her claims that Hunter, Bolin, Tyler, and Butler in their individual capacities only subjected her to inhumane conditions of confinement by failing to provide her with adequate drinking water. All othe r claims are dismissed without prejudice. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Hunter, Bolin, Tyler , and Butler. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. If any of the defendants are no longer employed by the Brassell Detention Center, the individual responding to service must file a sealed statement containing the unserved defendant's last known private mailing address. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/2014. (ks)
July 11, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/11/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?