Conic v. Shambley et al

Plaintiff: RoDerick Montay Conic, Sr
Defendant: Tammy Shambley, Latimore, Boudra and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00282
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 Recommended Disposition. Mr. Conic's lawsuit is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2015. (mcz)
March 18, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Conic's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/18/2015. (mcz)
August 29, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in its entirety. Mr. Conic's claims against Defendants Latimore and Hobbs are DISMISSED, without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate these individuals as party Defendants. In addition, Mr. Conic's claims for money damages against Defendants Shambley and Boudra in their official capacities are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/29/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conic v. Shambley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RoDerick Montay Conic, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Shambley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boudra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?