Quarles v. Briggs

Plaintiff: Kristina Quarles
Defendant: J Briggs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00302
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 80 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and denying 72 Briggs's motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/2015. (kdr)
March 12, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the motion for summary judgment filed by defts Adams, Briggs and Clark is granted 41 ; Quarles's claims against Adams and Clark and her claims against Briggs in her official capacity only, are dismissed with prejudice; Adams and Clark are dismissed as parties; pltf's motions for directed verdict 32 and to dismiss 47 are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/12/15. (tjb)
October 9, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety in all respects 6 proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and denying as moot 3 plaintiff's motion for a transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/9/2014. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarles v. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?