Dunahue v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Reginald L Dunahue
Defendant: Ray Hobbs and Grant Harris
Case Number: 5:2014cv00331
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 136 Order entered on this day, judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. This case is dismissed. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2016. (ljb)
November 10, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 93 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects and dismissing Mr. Dunahue's claims against Defendants Ray Hobbs, Grant Harris, Larry May, James Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Moses Jackson , Jeremy Andrews, Everett Litzey, Sedrick Foote, Marquis Lundy, and Paul Wright without prejudice. Mr. Dunahue's' claims of excessive force against Defendants Randy Watson and James Plummer will PROCEED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/2015. (rhm)
October 26, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 88 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Dunahue's motions for injunctive relief, 74 and 78 , are denied; and his motion to add defendants, 76 , is also denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/26/2015. (jak)
June 5, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 66 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 53 54 56 motions for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/2015. (ks)
May 11, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 52 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Dunahue's 49 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2015. (ks)
April 29, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will rule on Plaintiffs motions after the Defendants have had an opportunity to respond. The harm caused by a hunger strike is self-inflicted, and Mr. Dunahue can begin eating again at any time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/29/2015. (jak)
March 4, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 39 Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 33 Motion to Dismiss. The Court does not adopt Judge Deere's recommendation that Dunahue v. Smallwood, E.D. Ark. Case No. 5:07CV00136, be counted as a strike, leaving that issue to be decided if and when it would be dispositive of the case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/3/2015. (ks)
February 5, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to update the docket sheet to reflect the full names of Defendants James Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Randy Watson, Moses Jackson, Jeremy Andrews, James Plummer, Everett Litzey, Sedrick Foote, Marquis Lundy, and Paul Wri ght. Because Defendant Grant Harris, Deputy Director of the Arkansas Department of Correction, is already listed on the docket as a party in this action, the Clerk is requested to remove the duplicate entry for the party "Defendant Harris, Deputy Director". Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/5/2015. (jak)
December 18, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Reginald L. Dunahue may proceed on excessive force claims against defendants Larry May, Ray Hobbs, Moses Jackson, Grant Harris, Curtis Meinzer, James Banks, Randy Watson, Lieutenant Wright, and Lieutenant Plummer. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to add Lieutenant Wright as a party defendant. Dunahue's remaining claims are DISMISSED, without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate M. Allen as a party defendant. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/18/2014. (ks)
September 8, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty days to include only a short and plain statement of his claim. Mr. Dunahue is specifically cautioned not to attach any exhibits, including grievance forms, to his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/8/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunahue v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald L Dunahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?