Pinder v. McDowell et al

Plaintiff: Steven Pinder
Defendant: Alva Green McDowell, Dotson, Sonya Davis-Peppers, Jacqueline Carswell, Boston, Horner, Jane Doe, Floss, Roy Griffin, John Doe, Correct Care Services and Maxor Pharmacy
Case Number: 5:2014cv00359
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 206 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying as moot Mr. Pinder's 146 , 152 , 177 , and 187 motions; granting 160 and 174 motions for summary judgment; and granting 158 motion for sanctions. Mr. Pinder's claims against Maxor Pharmacy and the ADC Defendants are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/9/2017. (ljb)
August 8, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 135 Partial Recommended Disposition. The pending motions for summary judgment, 114 , 117 , and 120 are DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/8/2016. (mcz)
April 15, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 100 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendant Dominicis's 93 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, as moot. Mr. Pinder's 96 Response is to be filed as a supplement to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/15/2016. (mcz)
March 29, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 95 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Pinder's claims against Defendant Jane Doe are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/29/2016. (mcz)
April 20, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 Recommended Disposition. Mr. Pinder's claims are DISMISSED, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's 3/9/2015 Order. The pending motions (docket entries 23 , 25 , and 36 ) are DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/20/2015. (mcz)
December 5, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in all respects in its entirety 15 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Pinder's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/5/2014. (ljb)
October 14, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/2014. (jak)
October 6, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/6/2014. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder v. McDowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Pinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva Green McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Davis-Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxor Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?