Daniels v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Cody Daniels
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Connie Hubbard, Burnett and Does
Case Number: 5:2014cv00360
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 97 the recommended disposition; granting 83 defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing with prejudice plaintiff Codie Daniels's inadequate medical care claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/28/2016. (kdr)
December 17, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 72 granting in part and denying in part defts' 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; Daniels may proceed with his delay in surgery claim against Burnett and Hubbard, and with his post-surgical medication s claim against Hubbard; all other claims and defts are dismissed without prejudice; the case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Ray to set remaining discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/17/15. (tjb)
March 30, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant Burnett to file an Answer or other responsive pleading on or before 4/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/30/2015. (kcs)
September 30, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/30/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?