Black v. Brookshire Grocery Company

Plaintiff: Douglas L Black
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company
Case Number: 5:2014cv00384
Filed: October 22, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Black's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2016. (jak)
November 22, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will hold a status hearing on 12/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. in the Richard S. Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Ave., Little Rock, Arkansas, Courtroom B-155. If Black does not appear at the hearing, and confirm his readiness to go to trial on the scheduled date, then the Court will dismiss his case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Court directs the Clerk to send Black a copy of 18 Order and a copy of Local Rule 5.5, along with this Order by regular mail and by certified mail, restricted delivery, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/2016. (jak)
September 29, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion. Mr. Kitchens is relieved as counsel for Douglas Black effective upon filing of the three items contained in this Order. The Court will hold a pretrial at 11:00 a.m. on Wednesday, 1/11/2017 in courtroom B-155, Richard S. Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2016. (jak)
April 11, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates Brookshire Grocery's pretrial findings, but cannot hold the 9 May 2016 trial date. An older case must be tried that week. The 8 Final Scheduling Order is suspended. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/2016. (jak)
February 16, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status reports 9 & 10 noted and appreciated. The Court declines to refer this case for a settlement conference because Brookshire doesn't believe a settlement conference would be helpful. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/16/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Brookshire Grocery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas L Black
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company
Represented By: R. Scott Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?