Jackson v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Calvin Eugene Jackson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00388
Filed: October 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating Jackson v. Kelley, 5:14CV00388-DPM, and Jackson v. Kelley, 5:15CV00365-DPM-JJV. The first-filed case, 5:14CV00388-DPM, is designated the lead case and all future pleadings shall be filed in the lead case. All pleadings filed in 5:15CV00365 shall be docketed in the lead case. Because the lead case is stayed, all pending motions should be denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/1/2015. (ljb)
November 18, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining without prejudice 16 Recommendation. Motions, 12 & 15 , granted. Case stayed. Amended habeas petition due ninety days after state proceedings conclude. Status report due by 1 June 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2015. (jak)
August 7, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the Dismissal, 11 . The Court refers this case back to Magistrate Judge Volpe to consider Jackson's motion on its merits 12 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/7/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Eugene Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?