Nichols v. Pepper et al

Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Defendant: Sonya Peppers-Davis, Marvin Hughey and Alva M. Green/McDowell
Case Number: 5:2014cv00448
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 62 partial recommended disposition in all respects and denying 57 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/07/2015. (rhm)
August 18, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 the recommended disposition; ordering that Nichols be allowed to proceed with the inadequate medical care claims raised in 25 his first amended complaint against defendants Shock and Johnson, and service be ordered on both of th ose defendants; dismissing, without prejudice, the inadequate medical care claims raised in the first amended complaint against defendants Griffin, Hughey, and Green-McDowell, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; dismissing, without prejudice, 29 Nichols's second amended complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may granted; denying 24 30 Nichols's motions to amend the complaint; denying 14 Nichols's motion for preliminary injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/2015. (kdr)
July 9, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition ; allowing plaintiff to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defendant Sonya Peppers; directing the USMS to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on her without prepayment of fees and costs or security; dismissing Defendants Marvin Hughey and Alva M. Green, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith; and denying as moot 28 Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct his objection. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/9/2015. (kdr)
December 22, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/22/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Pepper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Peppers-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Hughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva M. Green/McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?