Palmer v. Beebe et al

Plaintiff: William Edward Palmer
Defendant: Mike Beebe and Does
Case Number: 5:2014cv00452
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Palmer's claims against Beebe, Cashion, and the Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice based on Palmer's substituted complaint. Palmer's claims against Suggs are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2015. (jak)
August 10, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 15 . Motions to dismiss, 9 and 12 , denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2015. (jak)
March 2, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Suggs and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, substituted complaint, and this Order on her without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Palmer hasn't pleaded any claims against former Governor Beebe, the John Does, or Cashion. The Court therefore dismisses them without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/2/2015. (jak)
December 22, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/22/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Beebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Edward Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?