Ruffin v. York et al

Plaintiff: Ray Ruffin
Defendant: Debra York, Rory Griffin, Felix, Felix Limb and Brace Company, Larry Norris, Corizon and CCS
Case Number: 5:2015cv00011
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 95 Recommended Disposition. Mr. Ruffin's constitutional claims against Defendants Felix and Felix Brace and Limb Company are DISMISSED, with prejudice. State claims are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/19/2016. (mcz)
June 20, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 93 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Ruffin's 88 Motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/20/2016. (mcz)
December 18, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion to Dismiss. Motions to compel, 64 and 68 , are granted in part and denied in part. Defendants must provide Mr. Ruffin a copy of any medical records maintained in their offices, as well as a copy of any written policies. It is unclear what Mr. Ruffin seeks in his request for "prior records" so that part of his motion is denied. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden and the Supervisor of the Law Library at the Varner Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/18/2015. (jak)
October 16, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Partial Report and Recommendations. Mr. Ruffin's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Defendants Griffin and Norris's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant York's 52 Motion for Summary Judgment are granted. Mr. Ruffin's claims against Defendants Griffin, Norris and York are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/16/2015. (mcz)
January 14, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/14/2015. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin v. York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Limb and Brace Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?