Brewer v. Watson et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Brewer
Defendant: Randy Watson, Moses Jackson, J Pruitt, Brooks, Brown, Ramey, Eddy Allen, Huyard, Sanders, S Taylor and Capps
Case Number: 5:2015cv00050
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 150 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting the defendants' 121 motion for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff Christopher Brewer's 2 complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/9/2016. (ljb)
June 1, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 138 and 140 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Dispositions in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; and granting Christopher Brewer's 129 and 130 motions to voluntarily dismiss. Brewer's claims against defendants Huyard, Brown, and Pruitt are dismissed without prejudice. Brewer's failure to protect claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2016. (ljb)
March 1, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition 128 ; plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss his claims against defendants Moses Jackson and Scott Taylor is granted; and plaintiff's claims against Jackson and Taylor are dismissed without prejudice 126 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/16. (tjb)
October 29, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 104 ; pltf's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss defts Watson and Ramey is granted 106 ; pltf's claims against Watson and Ramey are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/29/15. (tjb)
September 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 88 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 84 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Clarence Capps are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/2015. (ks)
September 1, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 70 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?