Lewis v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Arron Michael Lewis
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Steve Outlaw and Stanley Robinson
Case Number: 5:2015cv00058
Filed: February 24, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Recommended Disposition. Defendant Outlaw's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Mr. Lewis's first amendment claim against Defendant Outlaw is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Mr. Lewis's 37 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/23/2015. (mcz)
July 6, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 Partial Recommended Disposition; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Mr. Lewis may proceed on his first amendment claim against Defendant Outlaw. All remaining claims are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/6/2015. (ks)
April 6, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Lewis's retaliation claim is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/6/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Robinson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?