Harp v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Tony A Harp
Defendant: Larry Norris, Wendy Kelley, James Gibson, Derwin Metcalf, Larry Manning, Perry and Williams
Case Number: 5:2015cv00067
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 59 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/14/2017. (ljb)
May 4, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 45 partial recommended disposition; directing the Clerk of Court to alter the docket to reflect that defendant S. Baker is Shay Baker; granting Defendants' 42 motion for summary judgment; dismissing Harp's claims against defendants James Gibson, Shamone McPhadden, Ladarius Williams, and Larry Manning without prejudice; dismissing Harp's claims against defendant Shay Baker with prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/04/2016. (rhm)
May 5, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff's failure to train allegations against defendants Larry Manning and James Gibson for failure to state a claim upon with relie f maybe granted; dismissing, without prejudice, defendants Wendy Kelley, Larry Norris, and Derwin Metcalf due to plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted against them; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/5/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harp v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony A Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derwin Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?