Cook v. Bland et al

Plaintiff: Don Cook
Defendant: Estella Bland and William Warren
Case Number: 5:2015cv00068
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Estella Bland's 70 motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice Don Cook's 2 complaint with respect to his claims against Bland; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/7/2016. (ljb)
January 28, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 48 the partial recommended disposition in all respects; denying 41 plaintiff's motion to add evidence; and denying 16 25 motions for preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/28/2016. (kdr)
January 21, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS plaintiff Don Cook's motion to dismiss his claims against defendant William Warran 42 is granted; Cook's claims against Warran are dismissed without prejudice; Warren's motion to dismiss 26 is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/21/16. (tjb)
August 28, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 4 the recommended disposition. Since the plaintiff has now filed 6 a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he has now complied -albeit late- with 3 the April 13, 20015, Order. This matter is therefore remanded to Judge Caveneau for further consideration. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Bland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?