Chapman v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie L Chapman
Defendant: Larry Norris, Wendy Kelley, James Gibson, Derwin Metcalf, Larry Manning, Shamone McPhadden, S Baker, Williams and T Perry
Case Number: 5:2015cv00103
Filed: April 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Chapman's official-capacity claims for damages are dismissed with prejudice. Chapman's claims against Perry and Baker are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/1/2017. (jak)
August 24, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partly granting and partly denying without prejudice 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Chapman's official capacity claims for money damages are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against Gibson and McPhadden are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. His claims against Perry and Baker remain for now. This case is returned to Magistrate Judge Kearney for further proceedings. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2016. (jak)
November 6, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed partial recommendation, 35 . Chapman's claims against Defendant Williams are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2015. (jak)
June 8, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Recommendation. Chapman's claims against Norris, Kelley, Metcalf, and Manning, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie L Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derwin Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamone McPhadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?