Self v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Wayne Self
Defendant: Keith Taylor, James Catoe, Christopher Griffin, Brandon Brinker and Michael Hughes
Case Number: 5:2015cv00119
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 66 Order, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/15/2016. (mef)
February 23, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 47 denying 39 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/16. (tjb)
September 21, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to re-issue a summons for Defendant Brinker. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, 2 , with any attachments, and the summons, upon this Defendant at the address provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/21/2015. (jak)
May 1, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Self's claims against Defendants Burl, Socia, Watson, Outlaw, Kelley and Williams are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/1/2015. (ks)
April 15, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Taylor, Catoe, Griffin, Brinker, and Hughes. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, with any attachments, 2 , and a summons for each of these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/15/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wayne Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Catoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Brinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?