Muhammad v. Wheeler et al

Plaintiff: Abdulhakim Muhammad
Defendant: Mark Wheeler, Randy Watson and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2015cv00130
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2018 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 and 144 ADC Defendants' motion and renewed motion to stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2018. (thd)
March 30, 2018 132 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW finding that Mr. Muhammad is entitled to injunctive relief; directing the parties to confer in good faith to arrive at a solution which will provide Mr. Muhammad with a halal diet that includes one daily servin g of halal meat consistent with this Order; directing the ADC to evaluate any and all options, including options never before considered by the ADC, to comply with the terms of this Order; and directing the parties to submit a written status report within 15 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2018. (cmn)
March 22, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and declining to adopt in part the 60 RD and denying Mr. Muhammad's 23 motion for summary judgment and Mr. Wheeler, Mr. Watson, and Ms. Kelley's 43 motion for cross summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/22/2016. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulhakim Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wheeler
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?