Breshears v. Hosmann et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Ray Breshears
Defendant: Kim Hosmann and Gary Hill
Case Number: 5:2015cv00187
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 90 Motion for copies. The Clerk is directed to send Breshears copies of the docket sheets in these three cases with a copy of this Order. Breshears's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Breshe ars's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees are paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Sheriff of the Saline County Detention Facility. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2016. (jak)
August 8, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal. The Court certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2016. (jak)
July 18, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion to reopen, 80 . If Breshears wants to pursue the claims the Court dismissed without prejudice, then he may refile them in a new lawsuit. But he can't skirt the PLRA' s payment requirements or the local rules by reopening a case that's been closed for six months. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
January 12, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Breshears's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction Transportation Unit are dismissed with prejudice. Breshears's remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2016. (jak)
November 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' motion to consolidate the third case, 2:15-cv-119 JM/JJV. The case filed first, Breshears v. Kelley et al, 5:15-cv-00149 DPM/JTR is designated as the lead case. All future papers must be filed in that case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)
August 31, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Breshears's negligence claims against Jane Does 1 and 2 for failure to state a claim. His claims against Kelley and Hill are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. His claims against the ADC Transportation Department is dismissed with prejudice and his claims against Skinner are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Drummond, Griffin, and Hoffman. The U.S. Marshal is dire cted to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order will not be taken in good faith.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2015. (jak)
July 6, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidated these two related cases, 5:15-cv-149 and 5:15-cv-187. GENERAL ORDER 39. The case filed first, 5:15-cv-149, is designated as the lead case. All future papers must be filed in that case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breshears v. Hosmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ray Breshears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hosmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?