Aaron v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Billy Charles Aaron
Defendant: Wendy Kelley and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 5:2015cv00215
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court of Appeals has determined that Aaron's notice of appeal, 14 , was untimely, 22 . That Court has also requested a merits ruling on Aaron's motion to extend his time to file a notice, 20 , which this Court previously denie d without prejudice as moot, 21 . Aaron hasn't explained why his initial notice wasn't filed on time and the docket materials don't provide an explanation either. Aaron's motion for an extension, 20 , is therefore denied. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/29/2015. (jak)
September 28, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 12 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Aaron's complaints about his conditions of confinement may be support for a 1983 lawsuit; but they are not grounds for habeas relief. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2015. (jak)
August 27, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Aaron's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Charles Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?