McCroskey v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Jerry H McCroskey
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2015cv00229
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 53 submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris; the motion for summary judgment on exhaustion filed by defendants Marvin Evans, James Gibson, Chuck Gladden and Wend y Kelley 34 is denied; defendants' motion for summary judgment on the merits 45 is granted and plaintiff Jerry H. McCroskey's complaint is dismissed with prejudice; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/6/16. (tjb)
November 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 21 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; and granting in part and denying in part Defendant Wendy Kelley's 7 and 17 motions to dismiss. The motions are granted to the extent that Plaintiff's claim for damages against Kelley in her official capacity are dismissed with prejudice. The motions are denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/10/2015. (ljb)
August 13, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 ; pltf's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice, and the Arkansas Department of Correction is removed as a party deft. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/13/15. (tjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCroskey v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry H McCroskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Delena C. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?