Brazil v. Arkansas Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Mary Brazil
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services, John Selig, Andy Allison, Marilyn Strickland, Drenda Harkins, Victor Sterling, Doug Nelson and Tracy Mitchell
Case Number: 5:2015cv00253
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Brazil's claims for job-reassignment retaliation and race discrimination against Victor Sterling, Doug Nelson, and Tracy Mitchell, in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Brazil's age-discrimination claim against the Arkansas Department of Human Services is dismissed with prejudice. All of Brazil's other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2017. (jak)
March 14, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has plenty of materials on the summary judgment motion. No more related filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2017. (jak)
February 27, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Brazil to respond to the 50 Motion for Summary Judgment by 3/6/2017, or the Court will consider the motion unopposed and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2017. (jak)
January 20, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Motion to Compel. Please follow the procedure outlined in the 29 Final Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/2017. (jak)
October 6, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Addendum, 34 , noted and appreciated. The Court again clarifies that it has not granted Brazil's motion to amend yet. The Court would appreciate a response to the proposed amendment by 10/14/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2016. (jak)
September 14, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion to amend, 30 , noted. Brazil must follow the Scheduling Order 29 and Local Rule 5.5, on proposed amendments. Addendum to motion with a redline showing all proposed changes (additions and deletions) due by 9/21/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2016. (jak)
February 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. Brazil's ADEA claim is dismissed. The Department is dismissed as a separate party with a caveat. Brazil has one live claim: her job-reassignment retaliation claim under 1983 against the managers in their official capacities, which means this claim is really against the Department itself. The Court directs the Clerk to add Brazil's email address to the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/4/2016. (jak)
December 18, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Brazil to respond to the 16 Motion to Dismiss by 31 December 2015, or the Court will rule on the motion without her response. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2015. (jak)
October 27, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Brazil's claims against Andy Allison and John Selig. Brazil's race discrimination claim is dismissed without prejudice. Brazil's fraud claims are dismissed without prejudice. The civil conspiracy clai m is also dismissed without prejudice. Brazil's ADEA claim may proceed for now. Because Mary Strickland and Drenda Harkins are in the case only because of the performance evaluations, they are dismissed. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare a summons for the Department, Sterling, Nelson, and Mitchell.The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazil v. Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drenda Harkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?