Berger v. Burl et al
Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Defendant: Burl, Does and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2015cv00262
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 163 order entered this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/23/2019. (ljb)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER that the parties have reached a settlement in principle, but need additional time to effectuate the terms of their agreement. Accordingly, this matter is administratively closed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/6/2019. (ljb)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER adopting 78 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Berger's 26 and 64 Motions for Summary Judgment, and the Defendants' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment on exhaustion are denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/28/2017. (mcz)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 73 motion to dismiss claims against the Doe defendants; and dismissing without prejudice the claims against the Doe defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/19/2017. (mef)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Adopting 36 Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants' 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED in part, and DENIED, in part. All claims for violation of the Free Exercise Clause and RLUIPA relating to the refusal to all ow Mr. Berger to grow a beard and long hair are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings on Mr. Berger's first amendment Establishment Clause claims are denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/22/2016. (mcz)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 33 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Berger's 29 Motion to stay proceedings, to amend the complaint and for injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/5/2016. (mcz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?