Holloway v. Straughn et al

Plaintiff: Winston Monroe Holloway
Defendant: William Straughn and April Sides
Case Number: 5:2015cv00288
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 69 the recommended disposition; denying 58 Defendant William Straughn's motion for summary judgment; denying 67 Plaintiff Winston Holloway's motion to strike; and denying as moot 80 Holloway's motion to introduce document. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/9/2016. (kdr)
March 7, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in all respects 37 proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting defendant April Sides's 21 motion for judgment on the pleadings; and dismissing with prejudice Holloway's claims against Sides. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2016. (ljb)
October 8, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; dismissing Defendants Kelley, Thurman, Barnett, Grimes, Wilson, and Harrington for failure to state a claim; and dismissing Plaintiff Holloway's claims of failure to follow ADC policy and destruction of property for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/8/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Straughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Monroe Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?