Racy v. Department of Agriculture

Plaintiff: Phyllis D Racy
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 5:2015cv00292
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting the USDA's 23 motion to dismiss, or in the alternative motion for summary judgment. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/2016. (ljb)
June 1, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The plaintiff may submit to the Court evidence that is pertinent to the defendant's 23 motion for summary judgment, but must do so within 14 days from the entry of this opinion and order and the defendant may file a reply to that response within 7 days from its filing. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2016. (ljb)
December 15, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 14 Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racy v. Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis D Racy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?