King v. Viva Beverages

Plaintiff: Nancy King
Defendant: Viva Beverages
Case Number: 5:2015cv00299
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2016. (jak)
April 4, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk to docket Viva Beverages' embedded motion to dismiss, 4 , as a separate entry. King's response to the motion is due 21 April 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/2016. (jak)
February 12, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reopening and extending the time for service until 15 March 2016. If King wants to pursue this lawsuit, she must do two things now: provide a summons to the Clerk's office for issuance; serve Viva Beverages properly with the Complaint and summons. King must do both things by 15 March 2016. And promptly thereafter, she must file proof of good service with the Court. Otherwise the Court will dismiss her complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Viva Beverages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Beverages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?