Pitts v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Eugene Issac Pitts
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2015cv00354
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion. The 5/16/2017 Order is adopted as supplemented. Kelley's 26 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. The Court concludes that Magistrate Judge Kearney did not clearly err or misapply the law in granting a stay. It will remain in place. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/21/2017. (jak)
August 18, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 and 54 Motion and supplemental motion to withdraw. John Wesley Hall is relieved as counsel in this case. Pitts's 53 Motion to proceed pro se is granted. His embedded motion or more time to file a pro se response is also granted. Any pro se response to Kelley's pending motion to lift the stay is due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/18/2017. (jak)
December 23, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as modified 4 Recommendation. The Court directs the Clerk to correct the docket: No. 6 is a supplement to the motion to proceed in forma pauperis, not a new motion. Petition, motion to stay, and motion to proceed in forma pauperis (as supplemented), 1 , 2 , 3 , & 4 , transferred to the Court of Appeals. The Court directs the Clerk to take all necessary steps to accomplish the transfer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Issac Pitts
Represented By: John Wesley Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?