Hughes v. Arkansas County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Otis Hughes
Defendant: Robbie Fread
Case Number: 5:2015cv00361
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Hughes doesn't update his address with the Clerk of the Court by 8/18/2016, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2016. (jak)
December 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Hughes's claim against Fread. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summonses for Pollard and Russell. The U.S. Marshal shall serve copies of the summonses, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on Pollard and Russell without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Court directs the Clerk to add Defendants Pollard and Russell to the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
November 17, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice Hughes's claim against the Detention Center. If Hughes wants to proceed with this lawsuit, then he must amend his complaint and specify who violated his rights and how. If Hughes doesn't amend by 12 December 2015, then his case will be dismissed without prejudice. If Hughes amends, then he must clarify what charges were pending against him at the time of the allegedly false imprisonment and the current status of those charges. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2015. (jak)
November 10, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Arkansas County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?