Irby v. Express Personnel Services

Plaintiff: Freddie Irby
Defendant: Express Personnel Services
Case Number: 5:2015cv00385
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/29/2016. (jak)
November 10, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have advised the Court that they have settled, 25 . Congratulations. The 22 Final Scheduling Order is suspended. The May 8th trial is cancelled. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice after 11/28/2016 unless a party seeks some relief before then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2016. (jak)
January 26, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Express Personnel Services. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, the Court's screening order, 4 , Irby's service update, 5 , and this Order on Becky Simpson as owner of Express Personnel Services without prepayment of fees and costs or security. If Ms. Simpson is not the owner or the registered agent, she may note this in her responding papers. In that event, she should also let the Court know who can accept service of the suit papers, if she has this information. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irby v. Express Personnel Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Personnel Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?