Smith v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy G Smith
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation and Curtis Peavy
Case Number: 5:2016cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2017. (jak)
February 24, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 47 Joint Report noted and appreciated. The 17 Amended Final Scheduling Order is suspended; the May 8 trial is canceled; and this case is stayed and administratively terminated. Joint status report due by 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/24/2017. (jak)
January 13, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion. 37 Motion granted with a clarification. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2017. (jak)
November 14, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2016. (jak)
November 8, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. The claims against Crete are dismissed with prejudice. By 11/15/2016 the parties' motion for a protective order final version should be sent to chambers for signature and entry, or the parties should file a joint notice advising the Court that no such order is needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/8/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Crete Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy G Smith
Represented By: John Richard Byrd, Jr.
Represented By: Earl Ross Downs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Peavy
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?