Ruth v. McGee et al

Plaintiff: Erwin Ruth
Defendant: Stan McGee, Brian Shaddock, Elgin, Loren Williams, Tate, Dallas County Jail and Does
Case Number: 5:2016cv00037
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 23 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing, without prejudice, the plaintiff's 2 complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/2/2016. (ljb)
April 13, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff should provide a viable address at which service for Defendant Tate may be attempted within 30 days of this order's entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/13/2016. (lej)
March 24, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to add Defendant Mike Griffin. Then, the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants McGee, Shaddock, Williams, Tate, and Griffin without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/24/2016. (lej)
March 22, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 5 Recommended Disposition; defts Dr. Elgin, Dallas County Jail and Does are dismissed without prejudice; if during discovery, Ruth discovers the names of these persons and can state specifically how they were indifferent to his serious medical needs he may seek leave to amend; the Court will treat Ruth's objections as an amendment to the complaint and directs the Clerk to amend the docket to reflect that Ruth's objection to the report and recommendation will be treated as an amendment to his complaint 6 ; the Court concludes that Ruth's complaint as amended in his objection states a claim against Stan McGee, Brian Shaddock, Laron Williams, Tate and Mike Griffin; the Court again refers this action to Judge Volpe for disposition or recommended disposition as appropriate for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/22/16. (tjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth v. McGee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shaddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?