Doyle v. Fread et al

Plaintiff: Gilbert Michael Doyle
Defendant: Robbie Fread, Peggy Pitts and Annette Clark
Case Number: 5:2016cv00054
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 47 Recommended Disposition, in its entirety. Mr. Doyle's 1 lawsuit is dismissed, with prejudice, and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/29/2016. (mcz)
June 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Doyle's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/28/2016. (mcz)
March 28, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Recommended Disposition. Mr. Doyle's access-to-court claims against Defendants Pitts and Clark are DISMISSED, without prejudice. The claims regarding failure to process grievances against Defendants Fread, Pitts, a nd Clark are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Defendants Pitts and Clark are DISMISSED from this lawsuit. Mr. Doyle's deliberate-indifference claim and an access-to-courts claim against Defendant Fread may PROCEED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/28/2016. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Fread et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Michael Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Fread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?