Nickelson v. Reed et al

Plaintiff: Kendell Nickelson
Defendant: Marshall Reed, Billy Straughn and T Gibson
Case Number: 5:2016cv00082
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 48 Report and Recommendations. Defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/8/2017. (mcz)
October 24, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendant's 25 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, as to Plaintiff's monetary claims against them in their official capacities. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/24/2016. (mcz)
June 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 3 Motion and 15 Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, which this Court construes as Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/24/2016. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickelson v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendell Nickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?